Khoury, Lara (CPSO#: 73425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Geriatric Assessment Unit
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16486
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lara Khoury Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Khoury ( CPSO# 73425 )

Business Address:
Geriatric Assessment Unit
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 715-8859

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARA KHOURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOURY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 11 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 04 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2004