Khullar, Atul (CPSO#: 78459)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 295 Bulyea Rd Edmonton AB T6R 1R8
Date Received: 14 Jun 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2018