Khuon, Chaut (CPSO#: 69326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
3328 McCarthy Rd
Ottawa ON  K1V 0H9
Phone: (613) 526-5515
Fax: (613) 526-0740
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 04 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Jun 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Khuon’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Khuon engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in that in that, amongst other things, he submitted untruthful information to the College in his Annual Renewal Forms for 2014, 2015, 2016 and 2017 in response to questions regarding hospital privileges and registration in other jurisdictions.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): January 8, 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2)
            As from June 7, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Chaut Khuon in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Khuon to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                          DR. CHAUT KHUON
                                          ("Dr. Khuon")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:
                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Khuon, certificate of registration number 69326, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Khuon, have read the Notice of Hearing dated April 19, 2018, which
                  sets out theallegations against me.  I am aware of the College's concern
                  about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (4)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking
                  in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

            (5)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR
                  Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Khuon, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately, ("Effective Date").

            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khuon, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (ii)  Review all pediatric patient charts at each meeting , on the
                              basis of the areas of concern identified in materials
                              provided to the Clinical Supervisor by the College and on the
                              basis of any concerns that arise during the period of
                              Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (v)   Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Khuon, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Khuon, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Khuon, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(d) and/or
                        (e) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (8)(f) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Khuon, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (10)  I, Dr. Khuon, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and and to any other
                  activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,
                  at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any Order of
                  the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (17)  I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Khuon is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee. As a result of the referral:
                  
                                    Dr. Khuon must practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B", respectively. 

            (20)  I, Dr. Khuon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (21)  I, Dr. Khuon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Khuon, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors and
                  Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of
                  the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A"; 
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking.
                  
                  
            (2 of 2)
            As from June 7, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Chaut Khuon in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Khuon to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. CHAUT KHUON
                                          ("Dr. Khuon")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Khuon, certificate of registration number 69326, am a member of
                  the College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7216070 (the "Investigation") into my practice of
                  emergency medicine.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Khuon, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khuon, undertake that I will not engage in any of the
                        following areas of practice:
                  
                        (i)   Emergency medicine in Ontario.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khuon, undertake that I will :
                  
                        (i)   Provide to the College a minimum of 120 days' notice if I
                              intend to resume my practice in emergency medicine;
                  
                  (ii)  Follow an Individualized Education Plan (IEP), as set out in the
                        IEP attached at Appendix "A";
                  
                        (iii) Complete the next available CHEO (Children's Hospital of
                              Eastern Ontario) Annual Refresher Course in Paediatrics; and
                  
                        (iv)  Undergo a reassessment of my practice in respect of my
                              paediatric patients approximately one year following my
                              completion of the IEP,
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khuon, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khuon, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Khuon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (12)  I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Khuon's
                              practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the
                              investigation, Dr. Khuon must not practise emergency medicine
                              in Ontario. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Khuon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Chaut Khuon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 7, 2018:

Dr. Khuon is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Khuon must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.


Source: Member
Active Date: June 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Chaut Khoun to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 7, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Khuon's practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Khuon must not practise emergency medicine in Ontario.