Khuthaila, Dana Khalid Majid Mohammed (CPSO#: 74264)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 31 Aug 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2012