Kieffer, Kellen George (CPSO#: 92900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hanover and District Hospital
90 7th Avenue Suite 327
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Phone: (519) 364-0910 Ext. 2
Fax: (519) 364-0920
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kieffer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kieffer ( CPSO# 92901 )
Dr. K. Kieffer ( CPSO# 92900 )

Business Address:
Hanover and District Hospital
Suite 327
90 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Phone Number: (519) 364-2340

Business Address:
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone Number: (519) 364-2820

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLEN GEORGE KIEFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIEFFER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2015