Kieffer, Rachel Joanne (CPSO#: 92901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone: 519-364-2820
Fax: 519-364-3965
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kieffer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kieffer ( CPSO# 92900 )
Dr. R. Kieffer ( CPSO# 92901 )

Business Address:
Hanover and District Hospital
Suite 327
90 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Phone Number: (519) 364-2340

Business Address:
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone Number: (519) 364-2820

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL JOANNE KIEFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIEFFER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2013