Kiehl, Tim-Rasmus (CPSO#: 84204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Universitaet Luebeck, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN, Toronto General Hospital
Eaton 11 444
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4626
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 10 May 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Tim-Rasmus  Kiehl  may  practise medicine independently in neuropathology,
            only.