Kilany, Ali Kuni Abubaker Ahmed (CPSO#: 76526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dufferin Subspecialty Clinic
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone: (416) 652-6101
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Accurate Heart Diagnostic Centre
Incorporated
Suite 205
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Canada
Phone: (905) 796-7333
Fax: (905) 796-7370
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kilany Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kilany ( CPSO# 76526 )

Business Address:
Dufferin Subspecialty Clinic
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone Number: (416) 652-6101

Business Address:
Accurate Heart Diagnostic Centre
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Phone Number: (905) 796-7333

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI KUNI ABUBAKER AHMED KILANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILANY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 16 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 17 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006