Kilborn, Tracy Nicola (CPSO#: 78803)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cape Town, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2003 to 14 Mar 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2003