Kim, Alexandra Victorovna (CPSO#: 85619)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:MOSCOW MEDICAL STOMATOLOGY INSTITUTE, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2006 to 12 Nov 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012