Kim, Brian Jae-Hoon (CPSO#: 86811)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012