Kim, Christie Yean (CPSO#: 90100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph Health Centre
30 Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 4300
Fax: (416) 530-6472
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CY Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kim ( CPSO# 90100 )

Business Address:
St Joseph Health Centre
30 Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIE YEAN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009