Kim, Do-Hoon (CPSO#: 76544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Do-Hoon Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kim ( CPSO# 76544 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DO-HOON KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2008