Kim, Justin (CPSO#: 79430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10A
30 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5R 3E7
Phone: (905) 712-2288
Fax: (905) 712-8228
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 25, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Justin Kim, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Kim to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                            DR. JUSTIN KIM
                                              ("Dr. Kim")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Kim, certificate of registration number 79430, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a College
                  investigation bearing File Number 7214094 (the "Investigation") into my
                  standard of practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking as
                  signed by me is accepted by the ICR Committee, the College will also
                  deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kim, undertake that, effective immediately:
                  
                        (ii)  I will cease to perform thyroid biopsies; 
                  
                        (iii) I will cease all office-based teaching activities until and
                              unless it is determined on reassessment that I meet the
                              standard of practice of the profession, subject to College
                              approval.
                  
            (7)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kim, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials relevant to my Clinical Supervision and
                              have an initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me and review at least fifteen (15) of my patient
                              charts, five (5) of which will include patients to whom I
                              prescribe narcotics, once every other week for four (4)
                              weeks. If, after four (4) weeks, the Clinical Supervisor
                              recommends it and the College approves, the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) will meet with me and review at least fifteen
                              (15) of my patient charts, five (5) of which will include
                              patients to whom I prescribe narcotics, once every month for
                              the remaining  period of Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (iv)  Observe one half day of patient encounters during the first
                              two (2) meetings, after which observation may cease upon the
                              recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) subject to
                              approval by the College;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College, at minimum, monthly
                              for the first three (3) months. If the Clinical Supervisor is
                              satisfied with the standard of practice after three (3)
                              months, and the College approves, the frequency of reports
                              may decrease to once every three (3) months.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the reports of the
                        medical inspector dated stamped May 19, 2015 and August 18, 2015,
                        and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Kim, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Kim, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Kim, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Kim, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Kim, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (7)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kim, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kim, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (8)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                        the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (8)(a).

                  (d)   I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge that I have completed the University of
                        Toronto Safe Opioid Prescribing course. I undertake to provide
                        proof to the College of my successful completion of this course
                        within two (2) weeks of executing this Undertaking.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kim, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (7) above
                        and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment will make use of any tools deemed necessary by the
                        College, which could include but is not limited to any one or more
                        of the following: a chart review, direct observation of my care,
                        interviews with colleagues and co-workers, and feedback from
                        patients. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kim, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Kim, understand and agree that if I am of the view that any
                        of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR Committee
                        will consider my submissions and make a determination regarding
                        whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable
                        and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Kim, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (9)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Kim, hereby consent to the following being included on the
                        public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                        conditions or limitations on my practice and/or which the ICR
                        Committee has identified in its decision referenced in section
                        (9)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kim, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kim, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Kim, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Kim, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of
                  all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation
                  of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (16)  I, Dr. Kim, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Kim was the subject of a College investigation into his
                        standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Kim will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                              *     Dr. Kim will engage in professional education in opioid
                                    prescribing.
                              *     Dr. Kim's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within 6 months of the end of
                                    the period of Clinical Supervision.
                              *     Dr. Kim will not perform thyroid biopsies.
                              *     Dr. Kim will cease all office-based teaching
                                    activities. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Kim, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (8) above and to all Clinical Supervisors and Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice, if any; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Kim, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff") and the director(s) of the University of Toronto
                  Family Medicine Longitudinal Program ("Director(s)"), and to provide said
                  Chief(s) of Staff and Director(s) with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Kim, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the professional education set out in section (8) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (8) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 25, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Justin Kim to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2016:

Dr. Kim was the subject of a College investigation into his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Kim will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.
• Dr. Kim will engage in professional education in opioid prescribing.
• Dr. Kim’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
• Dr. Kim will not perform thyroid biopsies.
• Dr. Kim will cease all office-based teaching activities.