Kim, Linda Eugenia (CPSO#: 77778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4104
Fax: (905)813-4347
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Yeung ( CPSO# 77885 )
Dr. L. Kim ( CPSO# 77778 )

Business Address:
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite B02
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-7538

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (416) 885-1022

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
102 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Suites 3, 4, 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3
Phone Number: (905) 751-1500


Corporation Name: Linda Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kim ( CPSO# 77778 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Clinical Genetics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (305) 813-4104

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 21 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA EUGENIA KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 15 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007