Kim, Peter Tae Wan (CPSO#: 92687)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2013