Kim, Raymond Hyonmin (CPSO#: 88939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fred A Litwin Family Centre in
Genetic Medicine at UHN & Mt Sinai
3L-400, Box 34
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4220
Fax: (416) 619-5523
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Familial Breast and Ovarian
Cancer Clinic
610 University Avenue, M-712
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: 416-946-2270
Fax: 416-946-6528
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital for Sick Children
Clinical and Metabolic Genetics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-813-5338
Fax: 416-813-5345
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
Familial GI Cancer Registry
60 Murray Street, L3-026, Box 24
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: 416-586-5112
Fax: 416-586-5924
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raymond Hyonmin Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kim ( CPSO# 88939 )

Business Address:
Fred A Litwin Family Centre in
Genetic Medicine
Suite 3L-400 Box 34
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Suote 700U-6W390
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND HYONMIN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012