Kim, Sandra Ann (CPSO#: 76234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Sahgal & Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kim ( CPSO# 76234 )
Dr. A. Sahgal ( CPSO# 76245 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue T-Wing
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4834

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA ANN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005