Kim, Sang Joseph (CPSO#: 71480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
585 University Avenue
11-PMB-129
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3228
Fax: (416) 340-4701
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sang Joseph Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kim ( CPSO# 71480 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
Room 11PMB-129
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3228

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANG JOSEPH KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2001