Kim, Simon Younghoon (CPSO#: 72585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

SUITE 202
589 LAKE STREET
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 937-4747
Fax: (905) 937-3618
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Simon Y. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kim ( CPSO# 72585 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON YOUNGHOON KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000