Kim, Song Hon Harry (CPSO#: 90596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 205
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 636-7008
Fax: (905) 636-1356
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Song Hon Harry Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kim ( CPSO# 90596 )

Business Address:
205 - 311 Commerical Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 636-7008

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 575-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONG HON HARRY KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014