Kim, Steve Young (CPSO#: 86500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Parsons Road
Unit 33
Alliston ON  L9R 1E8
Phone: (705) 435-7070
Fax: (705) 435-9339
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
PO Box 4000
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (705) 435-3377
Fax: (705) 434-5219
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steve Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kim ( CPSO# 86500 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke Walk-in Clinic & Family Physicians
Suite 106B
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 742-9449

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Unit 33
180 Parsons Road
Alliston ON  L9R 1E8
Phone Number: (705) 417-2901

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVE YOUNG KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012