Kim, Tae Hyong (CPSO#: 94284)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Seoul National University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 23 Nov 2010 to 09 Feb 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 10 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012