Kinaia, Ban Micheal (CPSO#: 94298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Medical Centre
Unit 3
130 Ouelette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Phone: (519) 971-2901
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kinaia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jan 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2013 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Ban  Micheal  Kinaia  may  practise medicine independently in family
                  medicine, only.