King, Charles Benjamin (CPSO#: 97007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Nov 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Rochester, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Village Family Health Team
Unit 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles B. King Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. King ( CPSO# 97007 )

Business Address:
Village Family Health Team
Unit 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone Number: (416) 599-8348

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Apr 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Charles  Benjamin King may practise medicine independently in family
                  medicine, only.