Kingwell, Stephen Peter (CPSO#: 77515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Orthopaedics
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13245
Fax: (613) 761-5100
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Kingwell and Nayar-Kingwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nayar-Kingwell ( CPSO# 77520 )
Dr. S. Kingwell ( CPSO# 77515 )

Business Address:
Active Care Medical
Unit 35B
2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1M2
Phone Number: (613) 761-6777

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Paediatrics
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN PETER KINGWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINGWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009