Kirby, John Martin (CPSO#: 79549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:National University of Ireland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland
Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MARTIN KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 19 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2017