Kirchhof, Mark Gajda (CPSO#: 94330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic
Parkdale Clinic
737 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4M9
Phone: (613) 761-4774
Fax: (613) 761-5093
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Kirchhof Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kirchhof ( CPSO# 94330 )

Business Address:
4th Floor
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 761-4774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK GAJDA KIRCHHOF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRCHHOF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2010 to 17 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Feb 2011 to 13 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014