Kirk, Gary Marc (CPSO#: 95196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Wisconsin

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 19 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2)
            As  from  October  19,  2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate  of  registration  held by Dr. Gary Marc Kirk, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by  Dr. Kirk to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                                ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                       of

                                          DR. GARY MARC KIRK
                                                ("Dr. Kirk")
                  
                                                       to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                                (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:
                  
                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code,  which is Schedule 2
                  to  the  Regulated  Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991,  c.  18,  as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "CPD" means continuing professional development;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means  the  College's register that is available to the
                  public.

            (2)   I, Dr. Kirk, certificate of registration number 95196, am a member of the
                  College. The College has inquired into my compliance with the requirement
                  to participate in a program of CPD.    

            (3)   I, Dr. Kirk, am currently not practising  medicine  in  Ontario  and I am
                  entering  into  this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with  the
                  CPD requirement under section 29 of Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under
                  the Medicine Act, 1991). 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Kirk, undertake  to  abide  by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   I, Dr. Kirk, undertake that, effective  immediately,  I will not practise
                  medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the following  conditions
                  have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the  College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I  provide  the  College  with  proof  that I am participating in a
                        program of CPD that meets the requirements  for  CPD  of  the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved  by
                        the  College  for  that purpose that meets the requirements for CPD
                        set by the Royal College  of  Physicians  and Surgeons of Canada or
                        the College of Family Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Kirk, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward
                  a  request  to  the  General Manager of OHIP that my  billing  number  be
                  deactivated for services  rendered after the date I cease to practise and
                  before the date the College  agrees  that  I  may  return  to practise in
                  accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (7)   I,  Dr.  Kirk,  undertake  to  abide  by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians  Who  Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice  Due  to  Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (8)   I,  Dr. Kirk, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred  to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr.  Kirk,  acknowledge  that  in  considering my request to return to
                  practice, the College may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified  terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request  that  I  enter  into  an  appropriate   assessment  and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Kirk, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.  arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I,  Dr.  Kirk, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision  of  this
                  Undertaking  may  constitute  an  act  of  professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of  specified  allegations  to
                  the Discipline Committee or Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

            (12)  I,  Dr.  Kirk, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing  and  executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I,  Dr.  Kirk,  acknowledge  that  this  Undertaking  constitutes  terms,
                  conditions, and limitations  on  my  certificate  of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I,  Dr. Kirk, acknowledge that, during the time  period  that  this
                        Undertaking  remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kirk, acknowledge  that,  in  addition  to  this Undertaking
                        being  posted  in  accordance  with  section  (14)(a)  above,   the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr.  Kirk  has  voluntarily  ceased  to  practise medicine in
                              Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients  or provide any
                              medical advice or services.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I,  Dr.  Kirk,  give  my  irrevocable  consent  to  the  College  to make
                  appropriate  enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution  that
                  may have relevant  information,  in  order  for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (16)  I,  Dr. Kirk, acknowledge that I have executed  the  OHIP  consent  form,
                  attached  hereto  as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.


            (2 of 2)
            The certificate of registration  held  by  Dr.  Gary Marc Kirk also carries the
            following term, condition and limitation imposed by the Registration Committee,
            effective December 6, 2012.

                  Dr.  Gary  Marc  Kirk may practise medicine independently  as  a  Medical
                  Officer of Health, only. 

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gary Marc Kirk to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 19, 2018:

Dr. Kirk has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.