Kirkham, Yolanda Ai-Hsin Butt (CPSO#: 82799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: Butt, Yolanda Ai-Hsin (used until: 03 Jul 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#260 - 340 College St.
Toronto, ON
Obstetrics & Pediatric, Adolescent,
and Adult Gynaecology
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 901-7756
Fax: (647) 350-3770
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
Dept of Gynaecology
76 Grenville St., 5th Floor
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7744
Fax: (416) 323-6330
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yolanda Kirkham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kirkham ( CPSO# 82799 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Gynaecology Clinic
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7744

Business Address:
260-340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 901-7756

Business Address:
Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Department of Obstetrics & Gynecology
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOLANDA AI-HSIN BUTT KIRKHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRKHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010