Kirtsman, Irina (CPSO#: 75720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian

Education:Rostovskij Medicinskij Institut, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
4 Montreal Road
Cornwall ON  K6H 1B1
Phone: (613) 938-7906
Fax: (613) 938-2138
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: (613) 938-4240 Ext. 2251
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Division Neonatology
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 14418
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irina Kirtsman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Kirtsman ( CPSO# 75720 )

Business Address:
205 - 4 Montreal Road
2nd Floor
Cornwall ON  K6H 1B1
Phone Number: (613) 938-7906

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Division of Neonatology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - New Hampshire

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRINA KIRTSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRTSMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2000 to 17 Nov 2000
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2001 to 01 Jun 2001
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2002