Kirubaharan, Rajaratnam (CPSO#: 73526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:North Colombo Medical College, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fenton Medical Centre
2 Fenton Road
Suite 4
Markham ON  L3R 7B4
Phone: (905) 948-9455
Fax: (905) 948-0570
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajaratnam Kirubaharan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kirubaharan ( CPSO# 73526 )

Business Address:
Fenton Medical Centre
4 - 2 Fenton Road
Markham ON  L3R 7B4
Phone Number: (905) 948-9455

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJARATNAM KIRUBAHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRUBAHARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001