Kirupananthan, Shamini (CPSO#: 92652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
312-1200 Markham Rd
Toronto ON  M1H 3C3
Phone: (416) 900-1002
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 511
2347 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T8
Canada
Phone: (416) 900-1002
Fax: (416) 900-6861
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shamini Kirupananthan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kirupananthan ( CPSO# 92652 )

Business Address:
312 - 1200 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 439-0701

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAMINI KIRUPANANTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRUPANANTHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Apr 2010 to 14 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Oct 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2017