Kis, Mihaly (CPSO#: 82506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 273-4449
Fax: 905-273-5503
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kis ( CPSO# 82506 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 273-4449

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIHALY KIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010