Kiser, Jason John (CPSO#: 92965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON JOHN KISER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KISER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2010 to 11 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 25 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2015