Kittmer, Tiffaney Chantal (CPSO#: 92817)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone: 519-524-8689 Ext. 5208
Fax: 519-524-8527
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1199 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G6
Canada
Phone: 519-396-3331 Ext. 4423
Fax: 519-396-5136
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kittmer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kittmer ( CPSO# 92817 )

Business Address:
Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8689

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIFFANEY CHANTAL KITTMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KITTMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015