Kitto, Kimberley Ann (CPSO#: 90820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South East Family Health Team
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone: (416) 699-7775
Fax: 416-699-7766
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberley Kitto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kitto ( CPSO# 90820 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
South East Family Health Team
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone Number: (416) 699-7775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY ANN KITTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KITTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 27 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011