Kives, Sari Leanne (CPSO#: 73346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fifth Floor
61 Queen St E
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7480
Fax: (416) 867-7478
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Seventh Floor, Black Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-6188
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sari Kives Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kives ( CPSO# 73346 )

Business Address:
55 Queen Street East
Suite 507
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARI LEANNE KIVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIVES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2003