Kizilbash, Kamran (CPSO#: 90221)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dow Medical College, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island
USA - Connecticut

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016