Klair, Amandeep (CPSO#: 95300)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018