Klair, Rajbir Singh (CPSO#: 90623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 104
15122 72Nd Avenue
Surrey BC  V3S2G2
Phone: (778) 564-0090
Fax: (778) 564-0094
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 106B
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Canada
Phone: (416) 742-9449
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Klair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Klair ( CPSO# 90623 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke Walk In and Family
Physicians
Suite 106B
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 742-9449

Business Address:
104 - 15122 72nd Avenue
Surrey BC  V4N 5K5
Phone Number: (778) 564-0090

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJBIR SINGH KLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2012