Klassen, Hilary Brooke (CPSO#: 97819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Little Lake Health Centre
Suite 501
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: 705-726-7427
Fax: 705-725-7313
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hilary B. Klassen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Klassen ( CPSO# 97819 )

Business Address:
Little Lake Health Centre
501 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 726-7427

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 29 Jul 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILARY BROOKE KLASSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLASSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 29 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 29 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2018