Klein, Anna Elizabeth (CPSO#: 88687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens Wellness Services
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2506
Fax: (613) 533-6741
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queens Family Health Team
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 533-9303
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Frontenac Medical Associates
201-791 Princess St
Kingston ON
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Canada
Phone: 613-544-2727
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bona and Klein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Klein ( CPSO# 88687 )
Dr. M. Bona ( CPSO# 86238 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Opthamology
Room B2-029
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Queen's Family Health Team
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3G2
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Business Address:
Queen's Wellness Services
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2506

Business Address:
Frontenac Medical Associates
791 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2727

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA ELIZABETH KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010