Klein, Benjamin Julius (CPSO#: 83411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
39 Mount Pleasant Street
Brantford ON  N3T 1S7
Phone: (519) 753-3153 Ext. 297
Fax: (226) 493-0194
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Klein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Klein ( CPSO# 83411 )

Business Address:
39 Mount Pleasant Street
Brantford ON  N3T 1S7
Phone Number: (519) 753-3153

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Aug 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN JULIUS KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 27 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 28 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2009