Klein, David Jeffrey (CPSO#: 73941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Donnelly Wing 4 054c
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3566
Fax: (416) 864-6013
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

586 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 507
Toronto ON  M4P1P2
Canada
Phone: 4164886980
Fax: 4164883998
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

390 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 208
Thornhill ON  L4J6X2
Canada
Phone: 9057099696
Fax: 9057099764
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JEFFREY KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004