Klein, Hannah Sarah (CPSO#: 95977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANNAH SARAH KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017