Klein, Jonathan Harris (CPSO#: 92902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Center for Radiation Therapy
Suite 201
1625 Poplar Street
Bronx NY  10461
United States
Phone: (718) 405-8550

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN HARRIS KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015