Klein, Shawn Ian (CPSO#: 95097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dufferin Steeles Family Medical
Centre
Unit 2
1881 Steeles Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y4
Phone: (416) 665-2900
Fax: (416) 665-2021
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN IAN KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014