Kleiner, Galit (CPSO#: 76210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: Kleiner-Fisman, Galit (used until: 11 Jan 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Hospital
Movement Disorder Clinic
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 784-3600
Fax: (416) 784-5600
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Galit Kleiner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kleiner ( CPSO# 76210 )

Business Address:
Baycrest Hospital
Department of Neurology
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 784-3600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GALIT KLEINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEINER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2006