Klingbeil, Kevin Russell (CPSO#: 94615)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Nov 2010 to 10 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2011 to 30 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2011